Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Ozga

Bishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1956 BornWola Ranizowska, Poland
7 Jun 198125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
24 Jan 199740.8AppointedBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon
20 Apr 199741.0Ordained BishopBishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Jan Ozga:
Bishop Jan Ozga (born ) Bishop of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Doumé-Abong’ Mbang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,994

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013