Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugeniusz Juretzko, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yokadouma, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1939Born
1956²16.0First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Sep 196121.7Solemn VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 May 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
20 May 199151.4AppointedBishop of Yokadouma, Cameroon
8 Sep 199151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Yokadouma, Cameroon
25 Apr 201777.3RetiredBishop of Yokadouma, Cameroon
16 Jan 201878.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Yokadouma, Cameroon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eugeniusz Juretzko
Bishop Eugeniusz Juretzko O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yokadouma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRadzionków, Poland
Ordained BishopYokadouma, Diocese of Yokadouma
Death PlaceLublińcu, Poland

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,550
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast