Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Serge Der Abrahamian

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon dei Armeni

Titular See: (Bishop for Armenian Clergy in Rome)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1868BornAlexandropolis, Armenia
13 Jun 193365.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
13 Jun 193365.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cucusus
16 Jul 193365.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cucusus
15 Jan 193869.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon dei Armeni
6 Jul 195284.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Serge Der Abrahamian:
Archbishop Serge Der Abrahamian (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013