Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Simon Kim Ju-young

Bishop-Elect of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1970 Born
15 Dec 199828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
21 Nov 202050.7AppointedBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)
Jan 2021³50.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ch’unch’ŏn, Korea (South)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon Kim Ju-young
Father Simon Kim Ju-young (born ) Bishop-Elect of Ch’unch’ŏn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHwaseong, Gyeonggi-do, Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ch’unch’ŏn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020
  • bp/ob: CB, 24 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 25 Nov 2020

Quantcast