Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elías Yanes Alvarez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1928Born
31 May 195224.2Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife, Spain
28 Oct 197042.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
28 Oct 197042.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mulli
28 Nov 197042.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mulli
3 Jun 197749.2AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
2 Apr 200577.1RetiredArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Mar 201890.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Elías Yanes Alvarez (VIAF: 58618149)
Archbishop Elías Yanes Alvarez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Cristóbal de La Laguna
Ordained PriestOlympic Stadium, Montjuic, Diocese of Barcelona
Ordained BishopSanta Cruz de la Palma, Diocese of San Cristóbal de La Laguna o Tenerife
Death Placela Fundación Tobías, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 Mar 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 736

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast