Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos López Hernández

Bishop of Salamanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1945 BornPapatrigo
5 Sep 197024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ávila, Spain
15 Mar 199448.3AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
15 May 199448.5Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Jan 200357.1AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
2 Mar 200357.3InstalledBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carlos López Hernández
Bishop Carlos López Hernández (born ) Bishop of Salamanca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salamanca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Apr 2016