Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel José Asurmendi Aramendia, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1940BornPamplona
23 Jul 196323.3ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Mar 196726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Jul 199050.3AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
30 Sep 199050.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona, Spain
8 Sep 199555.5AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
8 Jan 201675.8RetiredBishop of Vitoria, Spain
9 Aug 201676.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Vitoria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel José Asurmendi Aramendia (VIAF: 313545868)
Bishop Miguel José Asurmendi Aramendia S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vitoria

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,081
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2016
  • d: CB, 10 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 12 Aug 2016