Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Maria Conget Arizaleta

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1926Born
23 Jul 195124.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 199063.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Apr 199063.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
18 Oct 200174.9DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jose Maria Conget Arizaleta
Bishop Jose Maria Conget Arizaleta (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTauste

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,870
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017