Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Milián Sorribas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1939Born
25 Mar 196223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Nov 200061.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Nov 200061.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Diana
3 Dec 200061.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diana
11 Nov 200465.8AppointedBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
19 Dec 200465.9InstalledBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
27 Dec 201475.9RetiredBishop of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain
26 Nov 202081.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Milián Sorribas
Bishop Alfonso Milián Sorribas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Barbastro-Monzón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Cuba
Ordained BishopPilar, Basilica, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceMiguel Server, Hospital, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,863
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2014
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Nov 2020

Quantcast