Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Angel Belda Dardiñá

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1926Born
29 Jun 196033.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 197851.3AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
1 Apr 197851.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
13 Jun 198154.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tarazona, Spain
21 Feb 198255.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Tarazona, Spain
28 Jul 198356.8AppointedBishop of León, Spain
30 Aug 198356.9InstalledBishop of León, Spain
9 Feb 198760.4ResignedBishop of León, Spain
22 Feb 201083.4DiedBishop Emeritus of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Angel Belda Dardiñá
Bishop Juan Angel Belda Dardiñá (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast