Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Sánchez González

Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza-Guadalajara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1934 BornFuenteguinaldo
5 Apr 195823.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 198045.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
15 Jan 198045.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rubicon
19 Mar 198045.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rubicon
11 Sep 199156.9AppointedBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
2 Feb 201176.3RetiredBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Sánchez González:
Bishop José Sánchez González (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sigüenza-Guadalajara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sigüenza-Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013