Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Vera Aréjula, O. de M.

Bishop of Nacala, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1957 Born
25 Sep 197518.4ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
19 Mar 198123.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
11 Apr 198124.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
22 Aug 198124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
30 Mar 201557.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xai-Xai, Mozambique
30 Mar 201557.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
2 May 201558.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Barbara
25 Apr 201861.0AppointedBishop of Nacala, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Alberto Vera Aréjula
Bishop Alberto Vera Aréjula O. de M. (born ) Bishop of Nacala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguilar del Río Alhama, Spain
Ordained BishopXai-Xai, Diocese of Xai-Xai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nacala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2015
  • prof/c01: CB, 2 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 May 2015
  • c2+: CB, 6 May 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,490
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast