Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jesús Sanz Montes, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1955 Born
14 Sep 198530.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Sep 198631.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Oct 200348.7AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
23 Oct 200348.7AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
14 Dec 200348.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
21 Dec 200348.9InstalledBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Nov 200954.8AppointedArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain
30 Jan 201055.0InstalledArchbishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Jesús Sanz Montes
Archbishop Jesús Sanz Montes O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oviedo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast