Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atilano Rodríguez Martínez

Bishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1946 BornSan Julián de Arbas
15 Aug 197023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oviedo, Spain
5 Jan 199649.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oviedo, Spain
5 Jan 199649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Horaea
18 Feb 199649.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horaea
26 Feb 200356.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
6 Apr 200356.4InstalledBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
2 Feb 201164.3AppointedBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
2 Apr 201164.4InstalledBishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain

MicroData Summary for Atilano Rodríguez Martínez:
Bishop Atilano Rodríguez Martínez (born ) Bishop of Sigüenza-Guadalajara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sigüenza-Guadalajara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013