Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ant˘nio Wagner da Silva, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1944 Born
11 Dec 197127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
29 Mar 200056.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
18 Jun 200056.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
2 Jul 200359.2SucceededBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
6 May 202076.1RetiredBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ant˘nio Wagner da Silva
Bishop Ant˘nio Wagner da Silva S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFormiga
Ordained BishopSanta Terezinha, Church, Guarapuava, Diocese of Guarapuava, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guarapuava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,787
  • r: Bollettino, 6 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast