Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Murilo Sebastião Ramos Krieger, S.C.I.

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1943 BornBrusque
196420.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
7 Dec 196926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
16 Feb 198541.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
16 Feb 198541.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysinia
28 Apr 198541.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysinia
8 May 199147.6AppointedBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
22 Jul 199147.8InstalledBishop of Ponta Grossa, Parana, Brazil
7 May 199753.6AppointedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
11 Jul 199753.8InstalledArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
20 Feb 200258.4AppointedArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
12 Jan 201167.3AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
25 Mar 201167.5InstalledArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Murilo Sebastião Ramos Krieger:
Archbishop Murilo Sebastião Ramos Krieger S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 29 Oct 2014