Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Apaloryamam Ssentongo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moroto, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1936Born
21 Dec 196327.0Ordained PriestPriest of Masaka, Uganda
15 Dec 198852.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Masaka, Uganda
15 Dec 198852.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
18 Mar 198952.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
30 Mar 199255.3AppointedBishop of Moroto, Uganda
20 Feb 201477.2RetiredBishop of Moroto, Uganda
11 Dec 201983.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Moroto, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Henry Apaloryamam Ssentongo
Bishop Henry Apaloryamam Ssentongo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moroto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Maria
Ordained BishopN. D. de Compassion, Church, Masaka, Diocese of Masaka
Death PlaceNsambya, Hospital, Kampala, Archdiocese of Kampala

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,056
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2014
  • d: CB, 11 Dec 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast