Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Martin Wamika

Bishop of Jinja, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1953 Born
22 Sep 197926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tororo, Uganda
18 Oct 199340.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tororo, Uganda
18 Oct 199340.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
19 Feb 199440.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacapae
2 Mar 201056.5AppointedBishop of Jinja, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Charles Martin Wamika
Bishop Charles Martin Wamika (born ) Bishop of Jinja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jinja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast