Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Denis Kiwanuka Lote

Archbishop Emeritus of Tororo, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1938 Born
19 Dec 196527.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 199153.1AppointedBishop of Kotido, Uganda
18 Aug 199153.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kotido, Uganda
27 Jun 200769.2AppointedArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda
14 Sep 200769.4InstalledArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda
2 Jan 201475.7RetiredArchbishop of Tororo, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Denis Kiwanuka Lote
Archbishop Denis Kiwanuka Lote (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tororo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePallisa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tororo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,549
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast