Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Anthony Zziwa

Bishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1956 Born
16 Nov 198024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
19 Nov 200145.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
16 Mar 200246.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
23 Oct 200448.6SucceededBishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Joseph Anthony Zziwa
Bishop Joseph Anthony Zziwa (born ) Bishop of Kiyinda-Mityana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMubende

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kiyinda-Mityana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,147
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast