Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist Odama

Archbishop of Gulu, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1947 Born
14 Dec 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 199648.6AppointedBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
26 May 199648.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
2 Jan 199951.5AppointedArchbishop of Gulu, Uganda

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Odama
Archbishop John Baptist Odama (born ) Archbishop of Gulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiki-Oluku

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gulu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast