Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frederick Drandua

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arua, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1943Born
9 Aug 197026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arua, Uganda
27 May 198642.7AppointedBishop of Arua, Uganda
15 Aug 198643.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arua, Uganda
19 Aug 200966.0ResignedBishop of Arua, Uganda
1 Sep 201673.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Arua, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Frederick Drandua
Bishop Frederick Drandua (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUleppi

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: CB, 1 Sep 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast