Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyprian Kizito Lwanga

Archbishop of Kampala, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1953 Born
9 Apr 197825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
30 Nov 199643.8AppointedBishop of Kasana-Luweero, Uganda
1 Mar 199744.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kasana-Luweero, Uganda
19 Aug 200653.5AppointedArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda
30 Sep 200653.6InstalledArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Kizito Lwanga
Archbishop Cyprian Kizito Lwanga (born ) Archbishop of Kampala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaggalama

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kampala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,987

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast