Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Deogratias Muganwa Byabazaire

Deceased

Bishop of Hoima, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1941Born
9 Aug 196927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Hoima, Uganda
21 May 199048.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hoima, Uganda
18 Aug 199048.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Hoima, Uganda
9 Mar 199149.4SucceededBishop of Hoima, Uganda
8 Feb 201472.3DiedBishop of Hoima, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Deogratias Muganwa Byabazaire
Bishop Deogratias Muganwa Byabazaire (born , died ) Bishop of Hoima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarujubu-Masindi

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,188
  • d: CB, 8 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018