Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Ssemogerere

Bishop of Kasana-Luweero, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1956 Born
3 Jun 198326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
4 Jun 200851.9AppointedBishop of Kasana-Luweero, Uganda
23 Aug 200852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kasana-Luweero, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Paul Ssemogerere
Bishop Paul Ssemogerere (born ) Bishop of Kasana-Luweero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisubi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kasana-Luweero.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast