Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Kakooza

Bishop of Lugazi, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1952 Born
3 Jun 198330.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
2 Jan 199946.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kampala, Uganda
2 Jan 199946.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
17 Apr 199946.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
4 Nov 201461.9AppointedBishop of Lugazi, Uganda
3 Jan 201562.1InstalledBishop of Lugazi, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Christopher Kakooza
Bishop Christopher Kakooza (born ) Bishop of Lugazi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLusaze

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugazi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,499
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 3 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast