Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Joseph van Melckebeke, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1898Born
191617.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
24 Sep 192224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Mar 194647.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ninghsia, China
14 Mar 194647.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufes
11 Apr 194647.8AppointedBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
30 May 194647.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China
26 Aug 198082.1DiedBishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia], China

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph van Melckebeke
Bishop Charles Joseph van Melckebeke C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Yinchuan [Ningsia]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSint-Josse-ten-Noode, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Ordained BishopSuiyuan
Death PlaceSingapur

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 39
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast