Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Jean Marie De Smedt, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1881Born
189917.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Jul 190523.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
14 Dec 193150.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi], China
14 Dec 193150.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
17 Apr 193250.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
11 Apr 194664.3AppointedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
24 Nov 195169.9DiedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

MicroData Summary for Léon Jean Marie De Smedt
Bishop Léon Jean Marie De Smedt C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSint Nicolas, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSiwantze, Vicariate Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi]
Death PlaceKalgan

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,932, Number 19
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 29 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast