Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominic Aloysius Vendargon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1909Born
8 Dec 193425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Singapore
25 Feb 195545.4AppointedBishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
21 Aug 195545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
18 Dec 197263.3AppointedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
2 Jul 198373.8ResignedArchbishop of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia
3 Aug 200595.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for Dominic Aloysius Vendargon
Archbishop Dominic Aloysius Vendargon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kuala Lumpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaranthanai, Diocese of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
Ordained BishopSt. John's, Cathedral, Kuala Lumpur, Diocese of Kuala Lumpur
Death PlaceKuala Lumpur, Archdiocese of Kuala Lumpur
Buried Place (Original)St. John's, Cathedral, Kuala Lumpur, Archdiocese of Kuala Lumpur

  • a priest for 70.6 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 64
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast