Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Van Dyck (Dijck), C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Suiyüan [Hohot], China

Titular Bishop of Abbir Maius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1862Born
1882²19.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
30 May 188523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Aug 191553.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
10 Aug 191553.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
23 Jan 191654.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abbir Maius
4 Dec 193775.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Suiyüan [Hohot], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Van Dyck (Dijck)
Bishop Louis Van Dyck (Dijck) C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Suiyüan [Hohot]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoenhout, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Ordained BishopSoun-chou-tsoei
Death PlaceSuiyuan

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 33
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 7
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast