Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hohhot [SuiyŁan]

Archidioecesis Soeiiuenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 100,000 (38,625 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Archbishop's House, Hohot, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}
21 December 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mongolia Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of SuiyŁan [Hohot]
14 March 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of SuiyŁan [Hohot]
Archdiocese of Hohhot [SuiyŁan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of SuiyŁan [Hohot] Archdiocese of Hohhot [SuiyŁan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Hohhot [SuiyŁan]
195041,9321,065,7753.9%3633696073429ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Apr 2013