Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marian Jozef Rechowicz

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine

Titular Bishop of Pupiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1910Born
22 Jun 193322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
31 Dec 197363.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine
31 Dec 197363.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pupiana
3 Mar 197463.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pupiana
28 Sep 198373.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Marian Jozef Rechowicz
Bishop Marian Jozef Rechowicz (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHusiatyn
Ordained BishopWarszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • opd: CB, 11 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,356
  • 3p27: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast