Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Hyacinthe Cardinal Thiandoum

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dakar

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1921BornPoponguiné
18 Apr 194928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dakar, Senegal
24 Feb 196241.0AppointedArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
20 May 196241.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
24 May 197655.3Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197655.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
2 Jun 200079.3RetiredArchbishop of Dakar, Senegal
18 May 200483.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dakar, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Hyacinthe Thiandoum:
Hyacinthe Cardinal Thiandoum (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dakar

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1976
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 58
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015