Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cotonou

Archidioecesis Cotonuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Antoine Ganyé, Archbishop
  • Marcel Honorat Léon Agboton, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Nestor Assogba, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Benin
  • Square Kilometers: 3,233 (1,248 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocese-cotonou.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, 01 B.P. 491, Cotonou, Benin
  • Telephone: 21.30.01.45
  • Fax: 21.30.07.07

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Dahomey
26 June 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Costa di Benin Prefecture Apostolic of Dahomey (erected)
12 April 1892Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Dahomey Prefecture Apostolic of Togo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
25 May 1901ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Dahomey Vicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
28 April 1942Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey
Vicariate Apostolic of Foumban
Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara
Prefecture Apostolic of Jos
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaduna
Vicariate Apostolic of Khartoum
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouagadougou
Prefecture Apostolic of Niamey (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouidah
13 May 1948Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Dahomey Vicariate Apostolic of Ouidah
5 April 1954Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ouidah Vicariate Apostolic of Porto Novo (erected)
Archdiocese of Cotonou
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ouidah Archdiocese of Cotonou
5 April 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Cotonou
Diocese of Porto Novo
Diocese of Abomey (erected)
11 March 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Cotonou Diocese of Lokossa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ouidah
1949104,931947,40411.1%58581,809111723ap1951
Archdiocese of Cotonou
1970126,435424,33329.8%3022522,4312214017ap1971
1980206,987657,00031.5%1516316,6771919523ap1981
1990310,7801,179,12126.4%4039793,9335114930ap1991
1999438,6741,222,22235.9%66521183,7178826935ap2000
2000504,5031,411,68035.7%58521104,58610628037ap2001
2001507,8761,469,80134.6%60531134,4948827537ap2002
2002531,9341,557,14734.2%83531363,91113933839ap2003
2003580,4421,640,91635.4%93431364,26712435139ap2004
2004618,7171,826,22633.9%95501454,26711837640ap2005
2006654,0001,930,00033.9%111621733,78016340442ap2007
2010680,3262,168,00031.4%191652562,65717546363ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013