Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ziguinchor

Dioecesis Ziguinchorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dakar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Senegal
  • Square Kilometers: 7,339 (2,834 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 64 Rue du Dr. Gabriel Carvalho, B.P. 23, Ziguinchor, Senegal
  • Telephone: 33.991.26.13
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ziguinchor
25 April 1939ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Dakar Prefecture Apostolic of Ziguinchor (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ziguinchor
10 July 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ziguinchor Vicariate Apostolic of Ziguinchor
Diocese of Ziguinchor
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ziguinchor Diocese of Ziguinchor
21 January 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Dakar
Diocese of Ziguinchor
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaolack (erected)
22 December 1999Territory LostDiocese of Ziguinchor Diocese of Kolda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Ziguinchor
195019,355325,0006.0%2192192119122ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Ziguinchor
Diocese of Ziguinchor
196940,000600,0006.7%1530458885010321ap1971
198050,000800,0006.3%2124451,1114822810ap1981
199084,0391,178,1577.1%579661,2732412025ap1991
1999313,7001,990,17015.8%7611873,6052313623ap2000
2000231,793804,83028.8%7213852,726297316ap2001
200191,128557,60616.3%808881,035217620ap2002
200291,510557,90016.4%828901,016217820ap2003
200391,750558,00016.4%777841,092207820ap2004
200493,750562,00016.7%817881,065178025ap2005
2010108,696655,46516.6%907971,1201411825ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.3, 12 Dec 2012; data: 13 Dec 2012