Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raymond-Marie Tchidimbo, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1920Born
1 Jul 195130.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
7 Oct 195131.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
10 Mar 196241.5AppointedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
31 May 196241.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
13 Aug 197958.9ResignedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
26 Mar 201190.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Raymond-Marie Tchidimbo (VIAF: 56627492)
Archbishop Raymond-Marie Tchidimbo C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Conakry {Konakry}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConakry
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceVenasque, Archdiocese of Avignon, France

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 67
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast