Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Yandé Sarr

Deceased

Bishop of Thiès


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1934BornFadiouth
28 May 196429.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Oct 198652.0AppointedBishop of Thiès, Senegal
1 Mar 198752.4Ordained BishopBishop of Thiès, Senegal
18 Jan 201176.3DiedBishop of Thiès, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Jacques Yandé Sarr:
Bishop Jacques Yandé Sarr (born , died ) Bishop of Thiès

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013