Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Sagna

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ziguinchor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1920BornBignona
17 Mar 195029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ziguinchor, Senegal
29 Sep 196645.9AppointedBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
15 Jan 196746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
23 Oct 199575.0RetiredBishop of Ziguinchor, Senegal
12 Dec 201292.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ziguinchor, Senegal

MicroData Summary for Augustin Sagna:
Bishop Augustin Sagna (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ziguinchor

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 45.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013