Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfons Demming

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Gordus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1928BornSüdlohn
21 Dec 195325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
6 Nov 197648.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
6 Nov 197648.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Gordus
9 Jan 197748.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gordus
30 Apr 199870.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
31 Oct 201284.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alfons Demming:
Bishop Alfons Demming (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014