Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Wöste

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Thignica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1911BornLöningen
19 Dec 193625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
6 Nov 197665.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
6 Nov 197665.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thignica
9 Jan 197765.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thignica
20 Dec 198675.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Sep 199381.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Wöste:
Bishop Wilhelm Wöste (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013