Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Max Georg von Twickel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Lugura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1926BornHavixbeck
6 Aug 195225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197346.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
18 Jan 197346.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lugura
24 Feb 197346.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lugura
6 Jul 200174.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
28 Nov 201387.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Max Georg von Twickel:
Bishop Max Georg von Twickel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015