Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joăo Batista Przyklenk, M.S.F. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1916Born
8 Dec 194023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Missionaries of the Holy Family
1 Jun 196245.4AppointedBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Jul 196245.5Ordained BishopBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
1 Mar 197659.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tromsř, Norway
19 Feb 197760.1AppointedBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Mar 197760.2InstalledBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Jul 198366.5ResignedBishop of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 May 198467.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Januária, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joăo Batista Przyklenk
Bishop Joăo Batista Przyklenk M.S.F. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Januária

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrandewalde-Wiesengrund, Germany
Ordained BishopSankt Maria Trösterin der Betrübten, Basilica, Kevelaer, Germany
Death PlaceJanuária, Diocese of Januária, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 109
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast