Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Tedeschini

Deceased

Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1873Born
25 Jul 189622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rieti, Italy
30 Sep 191440.9AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
31 Mar 192147.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
30 Apr 192147.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
5 May 192147.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
13 Mar 193359.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
16 Dec 193562.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
16 Dec 193562.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193562.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
25 Feb 193864.3AppointedDatary of the Apostolic Datary
14 Mar 193965.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
28 Apr 195177.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
2 Nov 195986.0DiedDatary of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Federico Tedeschini (VIAF: 88650021)
Federico Cardinal Tedeschini (born , died ) Datary of Apostolic Datary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntrodoco, Diocese of Rieti, Italy

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
  • a cardinal for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 27
  • xsta/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 34, and Page 35, and Page 240
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast