Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silverio Velasco Pérez

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Ticelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1881Born
18 Dec 192443.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
18 Dec 192443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ticelia
3 May 192543.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ticelia
5 Dec 192746.4DiedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Silverio Velasco Pérez
Bishop Silverio Velasco Pérez (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAranda de Duero, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopAranda de Duero, Archdiocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 25
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,627

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast