Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Antonino de Echeguren y Aldama

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1884Born
14 Jul 190723.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 193550.7AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
7 Apr 193550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
16 Aug 193753.2DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Justo Antonino de Echeguren y Aldama
Bishop Justo Antonino de Echeguren y Aldama (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmurrio
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vitoria, Diocese of Vitoria

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 24
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,981

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast