Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Manuel Cardinal Arce y Ochotorena

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1879BornSan Julián de Ororbia
17 Jul 190424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Pamplona, Spain
5 Feb 192949.5AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
16 Jun 192949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zamora, Spain
22 Jan 193858.4AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
29 Mar 194464.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
18 Feb 194666.5Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194666.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
16 Sep 194869.1DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Arce y Ochotorena:
Cardinal Manuel Arce y Ochotorena (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
  • a cardinal for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013