Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Feliciano Rocha Pizarro

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1870Born
10 Mar 189424.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 192858.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
9 Nov 192858.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
17 Mar 192959.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
28 Jan 193564.9AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
16 Aug 194575.5DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Feliciano Rocha Pizarro
Bishop Feliciano Rocha Pizarro (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinojal

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast