Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Inocéncio Lopez Santamaria, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Trebenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1874Born
29 May 189015.4EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
27 Dec 189116.9Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Sep 189722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
Nov 1919³44.8AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1925²50.0CeasedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1 Aug 193055.5AppointedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil
1 Aug 193055.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Trebenna
31 Aug 193055.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trebenna
9 Mar 195883.1DiedPrelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí, Piaui, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Inocéncio Lopez Santamaria
Bishop Inocéncio Lopez Santamaria O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate of Bom Jesus do Piauí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSotovellanos, Spain

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 55
  • qodm: CB, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast