Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Eguino y Trecu

Deceased

Bishop of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1881Born
31 Mar 190624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santander, Spain
2 Oct 192846.9AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
13 Jan 192947.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
17 Feb 192947.3InstalledBishop of Santander, Spain
7 May 196179.5DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for José María Eguino y Trecu
Bishop José María Eguino y Trecu (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzcoitia

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1929, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast