Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcelino Olaechea Loizaga, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1889BornBaracaldo
20 Dec 191526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 Aug 193546.6AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
27 Oct 193546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
17 Feb 194657.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
19 Nov 196677.9RetiredArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
19 Nov 196677.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Subbar
11 Dec 197081.9ResignedTitular Archbishop of Subbar
21 Oct 197283.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Olaechea Loizaga:
Archbishop Marcelino Olaechea Loizaga S.D.B. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Valencia

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013